EP1746449 - Microscope lens system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2009/49] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microlmaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolleschensky, Ralf Dipl.-Phys. Botzstr. 1 07743 Jena / DE | 02 /
Dobschal, Hans-Jürgen Am Kötschauer Weg 26 A 99510 Kleinromstedt / DE | 03 /
Brunner, Robert Dr. Berghoffsweg 6d 07743 Jena / DE | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
Wolleschensky, Ralf Dipl.-Phys. An der Promenade 3 99510 Apolda OT Schöten / DE | ||
02 /
Dobschal, Hans-Jürgen Am Kötschauer Weg 26 A 99510 Kleinromstedt / DE | |||
03 /
Brunner, Robert Dr. Berghoffsweg 6d 07743 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013007.7 | 23.06.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | DE20051034442 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034442 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746449 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746449 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/02, G02B21/08, // G02B7/02 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G02B21/33 (EP,US);
G02B21/02 (EP,US);
G02B21/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Mikroskopobjektivsystem | [2007/04] | English: | Microscope lens system | [2007/04] | French: | Système d'objectif de microscope | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | IE | 02.12.2009 | IT | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | LV | 02.12.2009 | NL | 02.12.2009 | PL | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | GB | 23.06.2010 | LU | 23.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
GB | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 23.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
GB | 23.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
GB | 23.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6122046 (ALMOGY GILAD [IL]) [X] 1-6,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 67 *; | [X]US6226118 (KOYAMA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10,14,15 * abstract * * column 8, lines 1-51 * * column 9, lines 11-13 *; | [X]US2003044967 (HEFFELFINGER DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]DE10303812 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [A] 12* paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2004165257 (SHAFER DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] * | Examination | US5153873 |