Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007002958 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100860752B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2008 | B1 | KR20060134532 | 28.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007006503 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1737155 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1885849 | 27.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 |