EP1737155 - Apparatus and method for configuring frame in a broadband wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Young-Bin 505-1902, Mokryeonwooseong APT Beomgye-dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ro, Jung-Min 405, Juseong Bldg., Dogok-dong 956-11 Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Cho, Young-Kwon 249-1204, Ssangyong APT Hwanggol 2danji, Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Dong-Seek 107-1802, SK APT, Suchun-ri Kiheung-eub, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lim, Eun-Taek 6-801, Samsung APT, Kwonseon-dong Kwonseon-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Young-Kyun 106-405, Life APT, Sangrok village, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Choi, Joon-Young 204, Artbil, Yeongtong-dong 1007-5 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013031.7 | 23.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | KR20050054290 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050054290 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737155 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H04L27/2601 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L5/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/36] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Rahmenkonfiguration in drahtlosen Breitbandübertragungssystemen | [2006/52] | English: | Apparatus and method for configuring frame in a broadband wireless communication system | [2006/52] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la configuration des trames dans des systèmes sans fil a bande large | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HANG ZHANG ET AL, "DL Traffic Channel Definition and Enhanced DL Resource Allocation for OFDMA PHY", IEEE 802.16 BROADBAND WIRELESS ACCESS WORKING GROUP, (20041104), pages 0 - 6, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/16/tge/contrib/C80216e-04_542.pdf#search=%22%22DL%20traffic%20channel%20definition%22%22, (20060823), XP002395999 [X] 1-32 * page 1 * | [A] - GUOQING LI ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Downlink dynamic resource allocation for multi-cell OFDMA system", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 37TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 9 - 12, 2003, ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031109), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 37, ISBN 0-7803-8104-1, pages 517 - 521, XP010701724 [A] 1-32 * page 517, column R, paragraph II - page 518, column R, paragraph B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2003.1291964 | [A] - REDANA S ET AL, "Performance evaluation of point-to-multi-point (PMP) and mesh air-interface in IEEE standard IEEE 802.16a", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. VTC2004-FALL. 2004 IEEE 60TH LOS ANGELES, CA, USA 26-29 SEPT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040926), ISBN 0-7803-8521-7, pages 3186 - 3190, XP010787461 [A] 1-32 * page 3187, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404649 | [A] - WANG YING ET AL, "Two-dimensional resource allocation for OFDM/TDMA microcellular networks", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. VTC2004-FALL. 2004 IEEE 60TH LOS ANGELES, CA, USA 26-29 SEPT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040926), ISBN 0-7803-8521-7, pages 3452 - 3456, XP010787517 [A] 1-32 * page 3452 - page 3453, column L, paragraph B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404705 |