EP1739658 - Frequency extension of harmonic signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QNX Software Systems (Wavemakers), Inc. 302-134 Abott Street Vancouver BC V6B 2K4 / CA | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems-Wavemakers, Inc. 302-134 Abbott Street Vancouver, British Columbia, V6B 2K4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giesbrecht, David 298 Sorauren Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6R 2G6 / CA | 02 /
Hetherington, Phillip 23 Fernway Drive Port Moody, British Columbia V3H 5H7 / CA | 03 /
Li, Xueman 4223 Pandora Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5C 2B4 / CA | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Hodges, Julia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013032.5 | 23.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | US20050168654 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: US 168654 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739658 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739658 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,US);
H04L27/32 (KR);
H04B1/69 (KR);
H04L65/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frequenzerweiterung von harmonischen Signalen | [2007/01] | English: | Frequency extension of harmonic signals | [2007/01] | French: | Extension fréquentielle de signaux harmoniques | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 04.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0497050 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-32 * column 2, lines 24-37 * * column 3, lines 31-42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0706299 (FIDELIX Y K [JP]) [A] 1,11,21,27 * figures 7,11 * * column 14, lines 2-9 * * column 14, line 54 - column 15, line 2 * * column 16, line 52 - column 17, line 22 *; | [A]WO9806090 (UNIV SHERBROOKE [CA], et al) [A] 1,11,21,27 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 18 * * page 14, line 11 - page 19, line 12 ** figure 2a *; | [Y]WO0118960 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-32 * page 1, lines 10-18 * * page 2, lines 12-14 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 29 *; | [A]US6504935 (JACKSON DOUGLAS L [US]) [A] 1,11,21,27 * figure 3 * * column 3, lines 6-48 * * column 4, lines 1-30 * * column 3, lines 25-33 * * column 20, lines 22-24 *; | [A]US2003050786 (JAX PETER [DE], et al) [A] 5,15,25,31 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * |