EP1748360 - System and method for executing a parallelised software update [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartkopp, Oliver Adlerstrasse 4 31228 Peine / DE | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2019/12] |
Former [2007/44] | Zucker, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013061.4 | 24.06.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | DE20051034820 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034820 | [2007/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748360 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748360 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F9/445, G07C5/08 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP);
G07C5/0808 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/05] | G06F9/445, G07C5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Ausführen eines parallelisierten Softwareupdates | [2007/05] | English: | System and method for executing a parallelised software update | [2007/05] | French: | Système et procédé destinés à réaliser une mise à jour logicielle parallélisée | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2006 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | AT | 24.06.2019 | IE | 24.06.2019 | LU | 24.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
AT | 24.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.06.2019 | ||
LU | 24.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
AT | 24.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.06.2019 | ||
LU | 24.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.06.2019 | ||
LU | 24.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IE | 24.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6347363 (ARIMILLI RAVI KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XA]DE10107263 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1-3; claims 1-16 * * column 6, paragraph 22 - paragraph 23 * * column 4, paragraph 20 - column 6, paragraph 23 * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 7 * * column 3, paragraph 11 - column 4, paragraph 15 * [A] 2-5,7-11; | [X]US2005097541 (HOLLAND STEVEN W [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 5 * * page 1, column R, paragraph 10 - page 2, column R, paragraph 16 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 18 - page 4, column L, paragraph 24 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-20 *; | [PX]DE102004020880 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE102005057776 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [PA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - ZELTWANGER H, "AN INSIDE LOOK AT THE FUNDAMENTALS OF CAN ORIGINALLY DESIGNED FOR AUTOMOBILES, THE CONTROLLER AREA NETWORK (CAN) IS A SERIAL BUS WITH LARGE POTENTIAL USE IN INDUSTRY", CONTROL ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (199501), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0010-8049, pages 51 - 54,56, XP000500026 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * * column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * column 3, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * figures 1-3 * * column 4, paragraph 1 - column 6, paragraph 1 * * column 6, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * | [A] - "BOSCH CAN SPECIFICATION VERSION 2.0", BOSCH CAN SPECIFICATION VERSION 2.0, (199109), pages 1 - 69, XP002291910 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |