EP1698310 - Intervertebral implant folding apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Replication Medical, INC. 100 Jersey Avenue Unit D New Brunswick NJ 080901 / US | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoy, Vladimir U Potoka 145 Tuchomerice 25267 Praha Zapad / CZ | 02 /
Dickhudt, Eugene, A. 801 Continental Drive New Brighton MN 55112 / US | 03 /
Ziebol, Robert 13041 Jefferson Str. NE Blaine MN 55434 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
Stoy, Vladimir 8 Robert Road Princeton NJ 08540 / US | ||
02 /
Dickhudt, Eugene, A. 801 Continental Drive St. Paul MN 55112 / US | |||
03 /
Ziebol, Robert 13041 Jefferson Str. NE Blaine MN 55434 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013155.4 | 12.09.2003 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | US20020410458P | 13.09.2002 Original published format: US 410458 P | US20020423864P | 05.11.2002 Original published format: US 423864 P | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1698310 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1698310 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698310 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, // A61F2/44 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/0095 (EP);
A61F2/442 (EP);
A61F2/4611 (EP);
A61F2002/30069 (EP);
A61F2002/30075 (EP);
A61F2002/30113 (EP);
A61F2002/30563 (EP);
A61F2002/4622 (EP);
A61F2002/4627 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | A61F2/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Faltung von Zwischenwirbelimplantaten | [2006/36] | English: | Intervertebral implant folding apparatus and method | [2006/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil de pliage pour l'implant intervertébral | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03754568.8 / EP1539053 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | AT | 12.09.2008 | GB | 12.09.2008 | IE | 12.09.2008 | IT | 12.09.2008 | LU | 12.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | FR | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
AT | 12.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.09.2008 | ||
IT | 12.09.2008 | ||
LU | 12.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
AT | 12.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.09.2008 | ||
IT | 12.09.2008 | ||
LU | 12.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
AT | 12.09.2008 | ||
GB | 12.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.09.2008 | ||
IT | 12.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | BE | 28.05.2008 | |
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 28.05.2008 | |
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002123808 (LI LEHMANN K [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0064385 (LI MEDICAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * page 11 - page 13; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2808993 (CORNEAL IND [FR]) [A] 1,9,11 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5304182 (RHEINISH ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 27; figures 2-6 *; | [A]EP1114623 (HOYA HEALTHCARE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,11 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * |