EP1739740 - Power semiconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koike, Yoshihiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Okubo, Shinji c/o Hitachi Haramachi Electronics Co 10-2, Bentencho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0072 / JP | 03 /
Toyoda, Yasushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Saito, Katsuaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Hayakawa, Seiichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 06013397.2 | 28.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | JP20050190869 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005190869 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739740 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1739740 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/26, // H01L23/24, H01L23/31 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H01L23/24 (EP);
H01L23/16 (EP);
H01L23/3135 (EP);
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L23/49811 (EP);
H01L24/37 (EP);
H01L24/40 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L24/49 (EP);
H01L24/84 (EP);
H01L24/85 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2224/0603 (EP);
H01L2224/29101 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/37124 (EP);
H01L2224/40095 (EP);
H01L2224/40225 (EP);
H01L2224/40491 (EP);
H01L2224/40992 (EP);
H01L2224/45014 (EP);
H01L2224/45015 (EP);
H01L2224/45124 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48095 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48455 (EP);
H01L2224/48472 (EP);
H01L2224/48699 (EP);
H01L2224/48992 (EP);
H01L2224/48997 (EP);
H01L2224/49113 (EP);
H01L2224/49171 (EP);
H01L2224/73221 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/83801 (EP);
H01L2224/84205 (EP);
H01L2224/84801 (EP);
H01L2224/85205 (EP);
H01L2224/8592 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/45 (EP);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01028 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/01042 (EP);
H01L2924/01078 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2924/10253 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
H01L2924/13055 (EP);
H01L2924/15787 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29101, H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2224/37124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45014, H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/2076 (EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48095, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48095, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/48992, H01L2224/48455 (EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48472, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73221, H01L2224/40225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/83801, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/84205, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/85205, H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/8592, H01L2924/0665 (EP);
H01L2224/8592, H01L2924/0695 (EP);
H01L2224/8592, H01L2924/0715 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45014, H01L2924/206 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/73221 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/78, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/3512, H01L2924/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2007/01] | H01L23/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2008/51] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leistungshalbleiter | [2007/01] | English: | Power semiconductor | [2007/01] | French: | Semiconducteur à puissance | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 13.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5821850 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5850759 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0354056 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5525839 (SHU WILLIAM K [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19723202 (LG SEMICON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* figure 3D *; | [X]US6353258 (INOUE HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 10; figure 4 * | by applicant | JPS5850759 | US5525839 | US6353258 |