EP1741563 - Book or booklet with a book cover of synthetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wollenhaupt, Ulrich Brahmsstrasse 1 86179 Augsburg / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Gehrsitz, Stefan, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Gehrsitz, Stefan, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013502.7 | 29.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | DE20052010705U | 06.07.2005 Original published format: DE 202005010705 U | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1741563 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1741563 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B42D3/02, B42D1/04 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B42D3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/22] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Buch oder Broschüre mit einem Umschlag aus Kunststoff | [2007/02] | English: | Book or booklet with a book cover of synthetic material | [2007/02] | French: | Livre ou livret avec couverture de matière synthétique | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Divisional application(s) | EP09174767.5 / EP2154002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1236215 (JOSEPH-BENOIT CHARVET) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4650216 (CARLSON DENNIS W [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2002163175 (MENDOZA GABRIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004119278 (VANDEWALLE KRISTIN OLSON [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 31; figures 1-5h * |