EP1742393 - Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving data in a digital multimedia broadcasting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Yi Ling Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Song, Jae-Yeon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Jung, Ki-Ho Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06013872.4 | 04.07.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | KR20050059901 | 04.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050059901 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742393 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H04H20/42 (EP,KR,US);
H04H20/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/18 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Übertragen und Empfangen von Daten in einem System für den digitalen Multimediarundfunk | [2007/02] | English: | Apparatus and method for transmitting and receiving data in a digital multimedia broadcasting system | [2007/02] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour transmettre et recevoir des données dans un système de radiodiffusion multimédia numérique | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 26.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |