EP1742238 - Electrical contacts for vacuum circuit breakers and methods of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Shigeru c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Morita, Ayumu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Masato c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Kajiwara, Satoru c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Baba, Noboru c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F, Marunouchi Ct. Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2007/02] | Application number, filing date | 06014081.1 | 06.07.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | JP20050198210 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005198210 | JP20050240546 | 23.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005240546 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742238 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742238 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/02 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H01H1/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2008/13] |
Former [2008/03] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Kontakte für einen Vakuumschalter, und Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/02] | English: | Electrical contacts for vacuum circuit breakers and methods of manufacturing the same | [2007/02] | French: | Contacts électriques pour interrupteurs à vide, et méthode de production | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 05.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0385380 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0488083 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19535814 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH09171746 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1-18 * abstract * |