EP1876449 - Cell cycle-based blood test to diagnose Alzheimer's disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Leipzig Ritterstrasse 26 04109 Leipzig / DE | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arendt, Thomas Hüfferstrasse 61 04229 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
Stieler, Jens Jakobistrasse 21 01309 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Gartner, William J. 6636 North 48th Street Arizona 85253 Paradise Valley / US | 04 /
Grimes, F. Randall 11619 North Saint Andrew Way Arizona 85254 Scottsdale / US | 05 /
Weber, Donald F. 9444 East Whitewing Drive Arizona 85262 Scottsdale / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Patentanwälte Huber & Schüssler, Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014144.7 | 07.07.2006 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876449 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/5091 (EP);
G01N2333/70589 (EP);
G01N2333/70596 (EP);
G01N2800/2821 (EP);
G01N2800/2835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Zellzyklusbasierter Bluttest zur Diagnose von Alzheimer | [2008/02] | English: | Cell cycle-based blood test to diagnose Alzheimer's disease | [2008/02] | French: | Test sanguin basé sur le cycle cellulaire pour le diagnostic de la maladie d'Alzheimer | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10349162 (UNIV LEIPZIG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0014] , [0015]; claims 1-13 *; | [Y]US2002137108 (MULLAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-20 * * abstract *; | [Y] - LOMBARDI V R M ET AL, "Characterization of cytokine production, screening of lymphocyte subset patterns and in vitro apoptosis in healthy and Alzheimer's Disease (AD) individuals", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, (19990601), vol. 97, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 163 - 171, XP002307209 [Y] 5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(99)00046-6 |