EP1745868 - Extruded hollow aluminium alloy panel and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaida, Kazuhiro c/o Chofu Plant in Kobe Steel, Ltd 13-1, Chofuminato-machi Shimonoseki-shi, Yamaguchi 752-0953 / JP | 02 /
Sakae, Akira c/o Kobe Corporation Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
Kaida, Kazuhiro, c/o Chofu Plant in Kobe Steel, Lt 13-1, Chofuminato-machi Shimonoseki-shi, Yamaguchi 752-0953 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakae, Akira, c/o Kobe Corporation Research Lab. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014506.7 | 12.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | JP20050210081 | 20.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005210081 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745868 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745868 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21C23/14, B21C23/22 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
B21C23/14 (EP,US);
B21C23/10 (EP,US);
B21C23/142 (EP,US);
B21C23/22 (EP,US);
B21C33/004 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12375 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Stranggepresste Hohlkammerplatte aus Aluminiumlegierung sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2007/04] | English: | Extruded hollow aluminium alloy panel and method for producing the same | [2007/04] | French: | Panneau creux extrudé en alliage d'aluminium et son procédé de production | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 01.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2011 | BE | 28.12.2011 | CY | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | IE | 12.07.2012 | LU | 12.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
IE | 12.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005152962 ; | [A]JPH04157014 ; | [X]US5098156 (VOGEL IGNAZ [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 3-13 *; | [A]EP0508434 (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]) [A] 6,7 * column 2, line 39 - line 46 * * column 4, line 35 - line 43; figure - *; | [XA]DE19709315 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 44 - line 63 * [A] 4; | [X]EP1118498 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 9; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005152962 A 20050616 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920918), vol. 016, no. 450, Database accession no. (M - 1312), & JP04157014 A 19920529 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2002145116 | JP2003120116 | JP2004168106 | JP3645453B |