EP1713004 - Computer for dynamically determining interrupt delay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jinzaki, Akira c/oFujitsu Limited 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Hitching, Peter Matthew HASELTINE LAKE Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06014559.6 | 24.01.2002 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713004 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1713004 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713004 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/24, G06F9/46 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G06F13/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/42] | Title | German: | Computer zur dynamischen Bestimmung der Unterbrechungsverzögerung | [2006/42] | English: | Computer for dynamically determining interrupt delay | [2006/42] | French: | Ordinateur déterminant le retard d'interruption de manière dynamique | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02716364.1 / EP1471431 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5613129 (WALSH ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 10 - line 27 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 20 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 45 - line 49 * * column 5, line 17 - line 19 *; | [A]US6195725 (LUHMANN PATRICK J [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 38 - line 43 * * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 40 *; | [A]US5708814 (SHORT ROBERT T [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * claim 8 * * column 1, line 51 - line 62 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 10 - line 27 *; | [A]US5881296 (WILLIAMS STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |