|
01.12.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2006 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |