Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1750221
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.11.2010 |
Refusal of application |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.06.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.04.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
24.08.2007 |
First examination report |
|
23.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.07.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
05.01.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |