Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007018953 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47576606 | 27.06.2006 | US22021305 | 06.09.2005 | US7045205 | 02.03.2005 | US69910905 | 14.07.2005 | US54982304 | 03.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7644053 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2010 | B2 | US2005197992 | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7045205 | 02.03.2005 | US54982304 | 03.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007094219 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22021305 | 06.09.2005 | US69910905 | 14.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1750221 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22021305 | 06.09.2005 | US69910905 | 14.07.2005 |