EP1878755 - Ligand-modified ziegler-natta catalyst for olefin (co) polymerisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O.Box 330 06010 Porvoo / FI | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Väänänen, Marjo Helnäpellontie 34B 00700 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Stalhammar, Minna Koivumäentie 1 L 06450 Porvoo / FI | 03 /
Ko, Young Soo 706-903 Youlmae-maeul 7 danji-APT Jijong-dong, Yusong-gu, Taejon / KR | 04 /
Fredriksen, Siw Tyrisvingen 2 3744 Skien / NO | 05 /
Sutela, Marita Raatimiehenkatu 4 C67 06101 Provoo / FI | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014743.6 | 14.07.2006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878755 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/649, C08F10/00, B01J37/03 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Mit einem Liganden modifizierten Ziegler-Natta Katalysator und dessen Benutzung zur Polymerisation von Olefinen. | [2008/03] | English: | Ligand-modified ziegler-natta catalyst for olefin (co) polymerisation | [2008/03] | French: | Catalyseur Ziegler-Natta modifié avec un ligand et son utilisation dans la polymérisation d'oléfines. | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 17.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2840155 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DD282013 (BUNA CHEM WERKE VEB [DD]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9837108 (BUNA SOW LEUNA OLEFINVERB GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]US5925587 (LEE CHUN D [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0148037 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |