EP1857024 - Roman shade and drawing cord catch for this shade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profilux GmbH Bramfelder Strasse 60 c 22305 Hamburg / DE | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Thomas Bramfelder Strasse 60 c 22305 Hamburg / DE | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014983.8 | 19.07.2006 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | DE20062007842U | 16.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006007842 U | DE20062008890U | 02.06.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008890 U | DE20062008891U | 02.06.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008891 U | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857024 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857024 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857024 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47H5/14, E06B9/262 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
E06B9/262 (EP);
A47H3/10 (EP);
E06B2009/2622 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | A47H5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Raffvorhang und Zugschnurmitnehmer hierfür | [2007/47] | English: | Roman shade and drawing cord catch for this shade | [2007/47] | French: | Rideau plissé et élément d'entrainement pour corde de tirage de ce rideau | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 09.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2009 | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2006 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | AT | 19.07.2014 | GB | 19.07.2014 | IE | 19.07.2014 | LU | 19.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | FR | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.07.2006 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 19.07.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 19.07.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 19.07.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 19.07.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 19.07.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
GB | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202005011982U (BUENGER BOB TEXTIL [DE]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document * |