EP1758213 - Electrical socket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEGÄRTNER KARL GÄRTNER GMBH Lerchenstrasse 35 71144 Steinenbronn / DE | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumann, Andreas Jakobstrasse 27 71144 Steinenbronn / DE | 02 /
Philipp, Gerd Lahrer Strasse 16 71034 Böblingen / DE | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015013.3 | 19.07.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | DE20051041035 | 25.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005041035 | [2007/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758213 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758213 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
H01R24/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckbuchse | [2007/09] | English: | Electrical socket | [2007/09] | French: | Prise électrique | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | LT | 27.02.2008 | LV | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/01] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6416364 (SHI GUANGXING [CN], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 38 - line 61 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [DA]DE10242143 (GAERTNER KARL TELEGAERTNER [DE]) [DA] 1,5* page 4, paragraph 38; figures 2,3 *; | [DA]US2005153580 (SCHILLING ROBERT [US]) [DA] 1-4 * paragraph [0019]; figure 5 * | by applicant | US6416364 | US2005153580 |