EP1881703 - Socket for telecommunication networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEVES, S.A. Rua Benefica de Conxo No. 17 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santos, Julio Barrientos Avda. Eduardo Blanco Amor, 54-F 36003 Pontevedra / ES | 02 /
Garcia, Modesto Gomez Rua de Viena 8 D 2 D 15707 Santiago de Compostela / ES | 03 /
Carnero, Jose Luis Fernandez Mouromonto 15895 Calo - Teo / ES | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Dosterschill, Peter Dosterschill & Kollegen Fichtenstrasse 11 85570 Ottenhofen / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Dosterschill, Peter Petra & Kollegen Patentanwälte Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 18 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015089.3 | 19.07.2006 | [2008/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881703 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H04N5/64 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H01R24/525 (EP);
H04N7/106 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H04N5/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Steckdose für Telekommunikationsnetze | [2008/04] | English: | Socket for telecommunication networks | [2008/04] | French: | Prise pour réseaux de télécommunication | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/10] | Appeal following examination | 20.01.2015 | Appeal received No. T0842/15 | 20.03.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.12.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1215906 (EMC ELECTRONIC MEDIA COMM S A [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 26-44 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 38 * * figures 2A,2B,3 *; | [Y]US2005012869 (AKIYAMA TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1,2,9 *; | [A]DE20116556U (GIERSIEPEN GIRA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2005172322 (HOWARD DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP1215906 | US2005012869 | DE20116556U | ES20030002709 |