EP1746535 - Secure transaction string [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kanngard, Lars Olof Dar Al Buteen II PO Box 29522 Deira Dubai / AE | For all designated states Arnesson, Bengt Taij Palace PO Box 29522 Deira Dubai / AE | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Targett, Kenneth Stanley 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06015134.7 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | US20050595612P | 20.07.2005 Original published format: US 595612 P | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746535 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06F21/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/367 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3823 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Sichere Transaktions-Zeichenfolge | [2007/04] | English: | Secure transaction string | [2007/04] | French: | Suite de transaction sécurisée | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004107170 (LABROU YANNIS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0055] - [0061] *; | [X]US2004193553 (LLOYD JOSEPH ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * |