EP1747757 - Ultrasound system for displaying an elastic image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do / KR | ||
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114, Yangdukwon-ri, Nam-myun, Hongchun-kun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Hae Yean Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Cheol An Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Ra Young Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | [2011/36] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
Moon, Hae Yean Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daech-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Cheol An Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daech-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | |||
03 /
Yoon, Ra Young Discusser & Medison Building 1003 Daech-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | |||
Former [2007/05] | 01 /
Moon, Hae Yean Discusser&Medison Build.,1003 Daech-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Cheol An Discusser&Medison Build.,1003 Daech-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | |||
03 /
Yoon, Ra Young Discusser&Medison Build.,1003 Daech-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-280 / KR | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/05] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015465.5 | 25.07.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | KR20050068269 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050068269 | KR20050131465 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050131465 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747757 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747757 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1747757 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61B8/485 (EP,US);
A61B5/0053 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
G01S7/52042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/40] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultraschallsystem zur Wiedergabe eines elastischen Bildes | [2007/05] | English: | Ultrasound system for displaying an elastic image | [2007/05] | French: | Système à ultrasons pour visualiser une image élastique | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 01.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005066041 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X]EP1554982 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X]US2005119568 (SALCUDEAN SEPTIMIU E [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] *; | [A]US4926871 (GANGULY DIPANKAR [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 27 * * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 39 *; | [A]US5497249 (KOIZUMI TAEKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 11 * | by applicant | JP2005066041 | EP1554982 | US2005119568 | US4926871 | US5497249 |