EP1752350 - Automatic cable parking brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourlon, Philippe 23 rue des Blés d'Or 77230 Dammartin En Goele / FR | 02 /
Lefebvre, Cédric 36 Avenue des Lilas 93000-Bobigny / FR | 03 /
Sfriso, Thierry 7 bis Avenue Paul Langevin 93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systemes de Freinage, Service Brevets, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 06015632.0 | 27.07.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | FR20050008467 | 09.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508467 | [2007/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752350 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752350 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/74, B60T13/02, B60T7/10, B60T7/04, B60T11/04, B60T11/06 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B60T13/746 (EP);
B60T11/046 (EP);
B60T11/06 (EP);
B60T13/02 (EP);
B60T7/042 (EP);
B60T7/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | Automatische Kabelfeststellbremse | [2007/07] | English: | Automatic cable parking brake | [2007/07] | French: | Frein de stationnement automatique à commande par câbles | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IE | 03.03.2010 | IT | 03.03.2010 | LT | 03.03.2010 | LV | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | ES | 14.06.2010 | IS | 03.07.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | LU | 27.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 03.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
LT | 03.03.2010 | ||
LV | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR2726525 (ROCKWELL BODY & CHASSIS SYST [FR]) [DX] 1,5-8* the whole document *; | [X]EP1211149 (DURA GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract *; | [X]US6648107 (LUNDHOLM FREDRIK [SE], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004055832 (MERCER DANIEL ROBERT [US]) [Y] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2004089715 (FRENI BREMBO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract * [Y] 2-4 |