EP1748546 - Method of calculating power generating torque of synchronous generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umeda, Atsushi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Shiga, Tsutomu c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Ihata, Kouichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2007/05] | 01 /
Umeda, Atsushi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Shiga, Tsutomu c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
03 /
Ihata, Kouichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/05] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015832.6 | 28.07.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | JP20050220488 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005220488 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1748546 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1748546 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748546 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/18 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
H02P9/30 (EP,US);
H02P6/18 (EP,US);
H02P6/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/37] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Berechnung des leistungserzeugenden Drehmoments eines Synchrongenerators | [2007/05] | English: | Method of calculating power generating torque of synchronous generator | [2007/05] | French: | Procédé de calcul du couple générateur de puissance d'un générateur synchrone | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 14.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003074388 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,20* abstract *; | [I]US2004145355 (TANIGUCHI MAKOTO [JP]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [I]FR2850498 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document * |