EP1754771 - Process for treating biological material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stadtwerke Düsseldorf AG Höherweg 100 40233 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damm, Udo Holzstrasse 81 a 44869 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Erich, Egon Milanweg 18 47475 Kamp-Lintfort / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 200 221 40100 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | Bergen, Klaus Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06015891.2 | 31.07.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | DE20051036573 | 01.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036573 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754771 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1754771 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/00, C02F11/04 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C10J3/00 (EP);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M29/18 (EP);
C12M41/18 (EP);
C12M43/08 (EP);
C12P3/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | C10J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwertung von biologischen Materialien | [2007/08] | English: | Process for treating biological material | [2007/08] | French: | Procédé de traitemant de matériaux biologiques | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4334026 (CHYNOWETH DAVID P, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [X]EP1522529 (LAFONTAINE HANS JOERG DR [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11,12 * figure 1 * * claims 1,4,11,12 * * the whole document *; | [X]DE10245469 (KITTMANN ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document * |