EP1775346 - Disulfide crosslinked glycoprotein hormone analogs, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | [2009/25] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Laboratoires Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. 14 John B. Gorsiraweg Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moyle, William R 952 River Road Piscataway, NY 08854 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06015992.8 | 25.06.1998 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | US19970050784 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: US 50784 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775346 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775346 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C07K14/59, A61K38/04 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/59 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K38/27 (KR);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | 07.08.2006 | LT | 07.08.2006 | LV | 07.08.2006 | MK | 07.08.2006 | RO | 07.08.2006 | SI | 07.08.2006 | Title | German: | Disulfid-vernetzte Glycoprotein-Hormone, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [2007/16] | English: | Disulfide crosslinked glycoprotein hormone analogs, their preparation and use | [2007/16] | French: | Analogues d'hormones glycoprotéiques à liaison reticulée disulfide, leur préparation et utilisation | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98930477.9 / EP0996629 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]CA2188508 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [DX] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - A J LAPTHORN ET AL., "Crystal structure of human chorionic gonadotropin", NATURE., GB NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON., (19940709), vol. 369, pages 455 - 461, XP002085910 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/369455a0 | [A] - H XIA ET AL., "Identification of conserved amino acid residues in the beta subunit of human choriogonadotropin important in holoprotein formation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD., (19940708), vol. 269, no. 27, pages 17944 - 17953, XP002026122 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | by applicant | CA2188508 |