EP1749628 - Mould for die casting of pieces of crockery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinen- und Stahlbau Julius Lippert GmbH & Co. KG Boettgerstrasse 46 92690 Pressath / DE | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seer, Alois Pleysteiner Strasse 5 92727 Waldthurn / DE | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2007/06] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016318.5 | 04.08.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | DE20051036907 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036907 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1749628 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1749628 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749628 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/26, B28B7/00 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
B28B1/261 (EP);
B28B1/263 (EP);
B28B7/0011 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/06] | B28B1/26 | Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT, PT [2016/01] |
Former [2007/52] | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT, PT | ||
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckgussform zur Herstellung von Geschirrteilen | [2007/06] | English: | Mould for die casting of pieces of crockery | [2007/06] | French: | Moule pour le coulage sous pression de pièces de vaisselle | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | PT | 02.05.2016 | GB | 04.08.2016 | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2706803 (ELMETHERM [FR]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 29; figure * [Y] 12,13; | [Y]DE2107018 (KERAMAG KERAMISCHE WERKE) [Y] 12,13 * page 6, lines 3-8; figure 3 * * page 8, lines 13-21 *; | [X]EP0706865 (IDEAL STANDARD SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * page 2, column 2, line 51 - page 3, column 4, line 16; figure *; | [DA]DE10333979 (SAMA MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE10307669 (LIPPERT MASCH STAHLBAU J [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]AT69993B (SCHMIDT SCHE HEISSDAMPF) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10333979 | DE10307669 | AT69993B | DE102005002254 |