EP1749732 - Driver's modul for industrial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gülke, Norbert An der Renne 59 31139 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
Steinhoff, Jörg Silberkamp 4 38259 Salzgitter / DE | 03 /
Schönherr, Stephan Kasernstrasse 2 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2008/34] |
Former [2007/06] | 01 /
Gülke, Norbert, Dr. An der Renne 59 31139 Hildesheim / DE | ||
02 /
Steinhoff, Jörg Silberkamp 4 38259 Salzgitter / DE | |||
03 /
Schönherr, Stephan Kasernstrasse 2 38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016425.8 | 07.08.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | DE20051037190 | 06.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005037190 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749732 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749732 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D31/02, B62D47/02 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
B62D31/025 (EP);
B62D47/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | Fahrerarbeitsplatzmodul für ein Nutzfahrzeug | [2007/06] | English: | Driver's modul for industrial vehicle | [2007/06] | French: | Module de conduite pour véhicule utilitaire | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2008 | CZ | 05.11.2008 | DK | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | IE | 05.11.2008 | LT | 05.11.2008 | LV | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | GR | 06.02.2009 | IS | 05.03.2009 | PT | 06.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 05.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR893936 (SIAM) [A] 1,2,6,7 * pages 2-3; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4420097 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1218234 (ALCAN TECH & MAN LTD [CH]) [A] 1 * column 9, paragraph 63 - column 10, paragraph 72; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2004036266 (TARDINI GIAN PAOLO [IT]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, paragraphs 12,13; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 2, paragraph 42 *; | [A]US2005049944 (CHERNOFF ADRIAN B [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, paragraph 36 - paragraph 48 ** page 11, paragraph 114 *; | [PA]EP1588929 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE]) [PA] 1 * column 5, paragraph 26 - column 6, paragraph 29; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE4420097 |