EP1722477 - Iterative decoding apparatus and method with varying number of iterations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2010/30] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Chang Soo 72-2 Munjong-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-200 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Hyeon-Woo Byeoksan Apt. 806-901, Kwonson-dong, Kwonson-gu Suwon-shi Kyonggi-do 441-390 / KR | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016443.1 | 19.04.1999 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | KR19980013957 | 18.04.1998 Original published format: KR 19980013957 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722477 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1722477 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722477 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
H03M13/2975 (EP,US);
H04B7/15 (KR);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/3707 (EP,US);
H03M13/6337 (EP,US);
H04L1/0051 (EP,US);
H04L1/0066 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/46] | Title | German: | Iterativer Decoder und Decodierungsmethode mit variierender Anzahl von Iterationen | [2006/46] | English: | Iterative decoding apparatus and method with varying number of iterations | [2006/46] | French: | Décodeur itératif et méthode de décodage itératif avec un nombre variable d'itérations | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99914796.0 / EP0990307 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0632613 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 47; figure 2; claims 1,2,7,8 *; | [X] - REED M C ET AL., "A Novel Variance Estimator for Turbo-Code Decoding", PROC., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, MELBOURNE, AUSTRALIA, (199704), pages 173 - 178, XP002362580 [X] 1-7 * page 174, column R * * page 175, column R, paragraph 1 - page 176, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - BAUCH G ET AL, "Iterative equalization and decoding in mobile communications systems", PROC., EUROPEAN PERSONAL AND MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, (19970930), pages 307 - 312, XP002060630 [A] 1-9 * page 310, column R, paragraph 2 - page 311, column L, paragraph L * | [A] - ROBERTSON P., "Illuminating the structure of code and decoder of parallel concatenated recursive systematic (Turbo) codes", PROC. , IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE , GLOBECOM'94, SAN FRANCISCO, (19941128), VOL. 3, ISBN 0-7803-1821-8, pages 1298 - 1303, XP000488744 [A] 1-9 * page 1300, column R * |