EP1770306 - Double clutch transmission with a centrifugal starting clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuno, Kinya c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Yasushi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Hamaoka, Seiji c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016848.1 | 11.08.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | JP20050287983 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005287983 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770306 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/02, // F16H3/32, F16H63/18, B62K5/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H2063/025 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0043 (EP,US);
F16H3/32 (EP,US);
F16H63/18 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19228 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19233 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2007/50] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkupplungsgetriebe mit Fliehkraftkupplung als Anfahrkupplung | [2007/14] | English: | Double clutch transmission with a centrifugal starting clutch | [2007/14] | French: | Transmission à double embrayage avec un embrayage centrifuge comme embrayage à démarrage | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 18.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/48] | 26.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4748869 (OHTSUKA KUNIO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 23 - line 28 * * column 2, line 33 - line 56 * [A] 5 [Y] 1-4; | [Y]US2004025630 (HORI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figures 3-5 ** paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * |