EP1736132 - Device for applying a pulsating pressure to a local region of the body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/52] | Device for applying a pulsating pressure to a local region of the body and applications thereof | ||
[2010/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otivio AS Oslo Innovation Centre Gaustadaleen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | [2011/34] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Kongla AS Nils Lauritssonsvei 13C 0854 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Thermonor AS Petroleumsveien 8 4066 Stavanger / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filtvedt, Marius Kjenndalstopper 39 5225 Nesttun / NO | 02 /
Rein, Erling Bekkestad Gamble Helvikvei 2 1450 Nesoddtanger / NO | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06016917.4 | 30.12.2003 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | GB20020030344 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0230344 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736132 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736132 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736132 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61H9/00, A61H23/04, A61F7/08 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A61F7/00 (EP,US);
A61H1/008 (US);
A61H9/005 (EP,US);
A61H9/0078 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0029 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0054 (EP,US);
A61H2201/02 (US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0214 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0242 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0264 (EP,US);
A61H2201/105 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2203/02 (US);
A61H2205/06 (EP,US);
A61H2205/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur örtlichen Anwendung von pulsierendem Druck am Körper | [2010/40] | English: | Device for applying a pulsating pressure to a local region of the body | [2010/40] | French: | Dispositif pour l'application de pression vibratoire à une zone locale du corps | [2010/40] |
Former [2006/52] | Vorrichtung zur örtlichen Anwendung von pulsierendem Druck am Körper und Anwendungen davon | ||
Former [2006/52] | Device for applying a pulsating pressure to a local region of the body and applications thereof | ||
Former [2006/52] | Dispositif pour l'application de pression vibratoire à une zone locale du corps, et applications correspondantes | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03782687.2 / EP1583498 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030782687) is 19.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2011 | BE | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HU | 21.09.2011 | IT | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IE | 30.12.2011 | LU | 30.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
LU | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
LU | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
LU | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IE | 30.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 21.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2626601 (RILEY JOHN P) [Y] 39 * column 2, lines 19-28; figure - *; | [XY]US3094983 (MACLEOD NORMAN A) [X] 28,30-35 * column 3, line 71 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,3,4,9-12 * [Y] 29,36-39; | [A]US3403673 (MACLEOD NORMAN A) [A] 28-39 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3878839 (NORTON ROBERT L, et al) [Y] 29,36-38 * column 8, lines 2-33 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 5 *; | [DA]US5683438 (GRAHN DENNIS A [US]) [DA] 28-39 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 16 ** column 5, lines 30-35; figure 1 * | Examination | - REIN E.B. ET AL., "Hypothermia during laparotomy can be prevented by locally applied warm water and pulsating negative pressure", BRITISH JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIA, vol. 98, no. 3, pages 331 - 336 |