EP1892361 - Burglar-proof security window or door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sälzer Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Strasse 1-3 35037 Marburg / DE | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sälzer, Heinrich Weidenhäuser Strasse 36 35037 Marburg / DE | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Dirk Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Bauer, Dirk BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Bauer, Dirk BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06016974.5 | 15.08.2006 | [2008/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892361 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892361 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/52, E06B3/38, E06B5/11 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
E05D15/52 (EP,US);
E06B5/106 (EP,US);
E06B5/113 (EP,US);
E05D11/0027 (EP,US);
E05D5/0223 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, PL [2008/26] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsfenster oder -tür in einbruchhemmender Ausführung | [2008/09] | English: | Burglar-proof security window or door | [2008/09] | French: | Fenêtre ou porte de sécurité anti-effraction | [2008/09] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9211974U (SAELZER SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH, 3550 MARBURG, DE) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,2 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE9409388U (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP1516996 (SAELZER SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * claims 1,4,5 * * figures 3,7,15 * |