EP1757790 - Ignition timing control system for light duty combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walbro Engine Management, L.L.C. A Delaware limited liability company Suite 310 7400 North Oracle Road Tuscon AZ 85704 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Martin N. 1660 Colwood Road Caro, MI 48723 / US | 02 /
Born, Kevin P. 3936 Cass City Road Cass City, MI 48726 / US | 03 /
Burns, Michael P. 2600 Swaffer Road Millington, MI 48746 / US | 04 /
Pattullo, George M. 2330 Jacob Road Caro, MI 48723 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017147.7 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | US20050211835 | 25.08.2005 Original published format: US 211835 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1757790 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1757790 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/08, F02P5/15, F02D41/30 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F02D41/08 (EP,US);
F02D41/307 (EP,US);
F02P1/086 (EP,US);
F02P3/083 (EP,US);
F02P5/06 (EP,US);
F02P5/1504 (EP,US);
F02P5/1506 (EP,US);
F02P5/1508 (EP,US);
F02P11/025 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | F02D41/08, F02P5/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2007/50] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zündzeitsteuersystem für kleine Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/09] | English: | Ignition timing control system for light duty combustion engines | [2007/09] | French: | Système de commande de l'allumage pour petits moteurs à combustion interne | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001042542 (SATO NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8-13,16 * paragraphs [0031] , [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5138995 (ERHARD WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-13,16 * column 13, line 60 - column 14, line 12; figures 1,2,8 *; | [X]US2003056755 (KIESSLING LEO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-13,16 * paragraph [0101]; figures 14-16 *; | [X]US4553517 (ANDREASSON BO C [SE]) [X] 1-4,8-13,16 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 11; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US4338899 (GEIGER ISTVAN, et al) [X] 1,10 * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 4; figures 6,11 *; | [X]EP1277939 (WALBRO ENGINE MANAGEMENT LLC [US]) [X] 1,5-7,14,15 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]FR2648870 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,14,15 * figures 1,8,14 *; | [X]US4979477 (NICKEL HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,14 * figures 2,3 * |