EP1890455 - Method and apparatus for handover to a WLAN connection involving a trigger for mobility at Packet Data Gateway (PDG) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Punz, Gottfried, Dr. Lercheng 29/1/10 1080 Wien / AT | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Weidel, Gottfried, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 06017303.6 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890455 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H04W8/14 (EP);
H04W36/0019 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/164 (EP);
H04W76/22 (EP);
H04W80/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Handover auf eine WLAN-Verbindung unter Einbeziehung eines Mobilitätstriggers auf einem Packet Data Gateway (PDG) | [2008/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for handover to a WLAN connection involving a trigger for mobility at Packet Data Gateway (PDG) | [2008/08] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour effectuer un handover vers une connexion de réseau local sans fil au moyen d'un déclencheur de mobilité dans un Packet Data Gateway (PDG) | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 25.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |