EP1758217 - Optical apparatus having a laser light source unit, and image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuoka, Hiroshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai, Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017568.4 | 23.08.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | JP20050242796 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005242796 | JP20050282205 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005282205 | JP20060053201 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006053201 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1758217 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1758217 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/024 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/00559 (EP,US);
G02B7/008 (EP,US);
G02B26/124 (EP,US);
H04N1/1135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | H01S5/022 | Designated contracting states | [2008/27] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Gerät mit Laserlichtquelleneinheit und Bildaufzeichnungsgerät | [2007/09] | English: | Optical apparatus having a laser light source unit, and image recording apparatus | [2007/09] | French: | Appareil optique ayant une unité de source de lumière laser, et appareil d'enregistrement d'images | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5210650 (O'BRIEN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,7-14,17,18 * figure 5 * [A] 2-6,15,16; | [X]US4661959 (KANEKO YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,7-13 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2004130609 (MAEDA TERUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002001118 (NAKAJIMA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 3 * figures 2,44 *; | [A]US2002006041 (NAOE YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0973056 |