EP1763151 - Antenna diversity device for reception in vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuba Automotive Electronics GmbH Tec Center 1 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Delphi Delco Electronics Europe GmbH Delphiplatz 1 42119 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Delphi Delco Electronics Europe GmbH TecCenter 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUBA Automotive GmbH & Co. KG TecCenter 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindenmeier, Heinz Fürstenrieder Strasse 7 82152 Planegg / DE | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/29] | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS 64, avenue de la Plaine de France 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | Application number, filing date | 06017706.0 | 25.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | DE20051043304 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043304 | DE20061039357 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006039357 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763151 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1763151 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763151 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/08 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/02 (KR);
H04B7/08 (KR);
H04B7/0814 (EP,US);
H04B7/084 (EP,US);
H04B7/0874 (EP,US);
H04B7/0828 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/50] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antennendiversityanlage zum Funkempfang für Fahrzeuge | [2007/11] | English: | Antenna diversity device for reception in vehicles | [2007/11] | French: | Système à diversité d'antennes pour la réception dans des vehicules | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 29.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2006 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | AT | 25.08.2019 | GB | 25.08.2019 | IE | 25.08.2019 | LU | 25.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | FR | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
AT | 25.08.2019 | ||
GB | 25.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
AT | 25.08.2019 | ||
GB | 25.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
GB | 25.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1126631 (FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0877440 (HARADA IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0462338 (HEWLETT PACKARD LTD [GB]) [Y] 5,6,16-22 * figure 1 * * the whole document * [A] 1-4,7-15,24-26; | [A]US6281838 (HONG JOHN H [US]) [A] 5,6,16-22,24-26 * figure 3 * * the whole document *; | [YA]US2005064825 (FORRESTER TIMOTHY [US]) [Y] 12-14 * figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] * [A] 1-11,15-26; | [YA]EP0201977 (PHILIPS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 15 * column 4, line 20 - column 8, line 11 * * figures 1,2,8,9 * [A] 1-14,16-26; | [YA]JP2001186069 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 23 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 1-22,24-26; | [A]DE4321805 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0714178 |