EP1764281 - Baby stroller frame with seat direction changing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINK TREASURE LIMITED The Creque Building, Upper Main Street, P.O. Box 116, Road Town Tortola British Virgin Islands / GB | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Cheng-Fan No. 7-10, Ding-Shan Liao Hsin-Sern Li Xue-Jia Tainan Hsien / TW | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06017908.2 | 28.08.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | CN2005264656U | 17.09.2005 Original published format: CN 200520064656 U | CN2006262124U | 21.07.2006 Original published format: CN 200620062124 U | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764281 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764281 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764281 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/14 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
B62B7/14 (EP);
B62B2205/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Rahmen für einen Kinderwagen mit einem Mechanismus zur Änderung der Sitzrichtung | [2007/12] | English: | Baby stroller frame with seat direction changing mechanism | [2007/12] | French: | Châssis d'une poussette avec un mécanisme pour changer la direction du siège | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 04.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE50961 (RICHARDSON WILLIAM HENRY) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2842374 (BENSON RICHARD T, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 68; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE2652238 (OKUBO YOSHIHAZU) [A] 1 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0522783 (BRITAX TEUTONIA KINDERWAGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 1; figures 1,2,7,8 * | by applicant | US2842374 | EP0522783 |