EP1723919 - Device for securing spinal rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuan, Hansen 5066 Pine Valley Drive Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | 02 /
Nichols, David 40 Salem Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 03 /
Finley, Eric 8606 Hebrides San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/47] | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06017962.9 | 29.03.2000 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | US20000487942 | 19.01.2000 Original published format: US 487942 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723919 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1723919 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723919 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/44] |
Former [2011/09] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Festmachen von Wirbelsäulenstangen | [2006/47] | English: | Device for securing spinal rods | [2006/47] | French: | Dispositif de fixation de broches spinales | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 24.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, IE, IT | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00923103.6 / EP1248573 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000923103) is 02.02.2005 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9965415 (SURGICAL DYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE9403231U (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | Examination | US5562663 | US5496321 | WO0019923 | by applicant | WO9965415 | DE9403231U |