EP1762709 - Muffler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörge, Filip Albert Jozef Koen Achelmansstraat 37 3990 Wijchmaal-Peer / BE | 02 /
Alexnat, John W. Jörg St. Geertruisstraat 155 3700 Tongeren / BE | 03 /
Steenackers, Pieter D., Dr Waversebaan 248 3030 Heverlee / BE | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2007/11] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06018082.5 | 30.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | CH20050001484 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: CH 14842005 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1762709 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762709 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N1/16 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
F01N1/166 (EP);
F01N1/08 (KR);
F01N1/00 (KR);
F01N1/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Schalldämpfer | [2007/11] | English: | Muffler | [2007/11] | French: | Silencieux | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | IT | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | LV | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | PL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | AT | 30.08.2008 | LU | 30.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE125837 (NEW ANTHONY G.) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [DA]DE8908244U (HEINRICH GILLET GMBH & CO KG, 6732 EDENKOBEN, DE) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5246205 (GILLINGHAM GARY R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 57 - line 64 * * column 4, line 18 - line 32 * * figures 11-13 *; | [DA]DE19503322 (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US6427645 (GEYER WERNER [DE], et al) [DA] 1-14 * column 3, line 9 - line 62 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 2 * * figure 1 * |