EP1724525 - Combustion type waste gas treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komai, Tetsuo 1-2-17-902, Tsujidoushinmachi Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawamura, Kohtaro 1316-2, Kanamori Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tsuji, Takeshi 3-2-3-3208-841, Shiomidai Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Rikiya 19-1-103, Shirahataminami-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Okuda, Kazutaka, c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ishikawa, Keiichi 1-13-17-226, Nakamachidai Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Ohashi, Tomonori, c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Takemura, Yoshiro 2-19-37, Hinataoka Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 09 /
Muroga, Yasutaka 3-5-31, Daita Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Nishikawa, Tadakazu, c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 11 /
Shirao, Yuji 5-11-10, Okada Samukawa-machi Kuoza-gu Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
Komai, Tetsuo 1-2-17-902, Tsujidoushinmachi Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kawamura, Kohtaro 1316-2, Kanamori Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Tsuji, Takeshi 3-2-3-3208-841, Shiomidai Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Nakamura, Rikiya 19-1-103, Shirahataminami-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Okuda, Kazutaka 2-4-6, Higashimita, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Ishikawa, Keiichi 1-13-17-226, Nakamachidai Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Ohashi, Tomonori 661-2-418, Kariyado Nakaharo-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Takemura, Yoshiro 2-19-37, Hinataoka Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
09 /
Muroga, Yasutaka 3-5-31, Daita Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
10 /
Nishikawa, Tadakazu 4-6-8, A-202, Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
11 /
Shirao, Yuji 5-11-10, Okada Samukawa-machi Kuoza-gu Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018711.9 | 27.09.2001 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000302410 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000302410 | JP20000302411 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000302411 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724525 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/06, F23G5/32, F23J15/06, F23D14/82, F23K5/00, F23N1/02, A62C39/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F23C5/32 (EP,US);
F23J15/02 (KR);
F23D14/04 (EP,US);
F23G5/32 (EP,US);
F23G7/065 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/30] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Behandlungsvorrichtung für Verbrennungsabgase | [2006/47] | English: | Combustion type waste gas treatment system | [2006/47] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de gaz de combustion | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01122649.5 / EP1193443 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010122649) is 04.10.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2745476 (JOHN TETI) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, line 33 - line 54; figure 6 *; | [X]US3985494 (CHILDREE HERMAN TRAVIS) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,3,5 * * column 1, line 5 - line 16 * * column 5, line 18 - line 29 *; | [XY]US4144313 (GERMERDONK ROLF, et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 42 - line 55 * * column 3, line 1 - line 39 * [Y] 3; | [X]GB2023267 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 102 - line 117 * * page 1, line 126 - page 2, line 19 *; | [X]DE2857224 (BAYER AG) [X] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0205841 (VEBA OEL ENTWICKLUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 5* page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]GB2304180 (HI LO FLARE SYSTEMS & SERVICES [GB]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,5 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 5 * * page 8, line 10 - line 19 *; | [X]US5766000 (THOMPSON STANLEY P [US]) [X] 5 * column 2, line 15 - line 36 * * column 4, line 48 - line 57 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 17 *; | [A]WO0032990 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,4; | [PY]WO0133141 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [PY] 3 * abstract *; | EP1143197 [ ] (EBARA CORP [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 43 * * column 10, line 45 - column 11, line 32 * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | GB741722 | US3923448 | US4022441 | GB1479686 | DE2944509 | DE19530963 |