EP1762376 - Composite material with explosion welded intermediate part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANSEE SE 6600 Reutte / AT | [2010/43] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states PLANSEE SE 6600 Reutte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schedler, Bertram Ehrenbergstrasse 43 6600 Reutte / AT | 02 /
Scheiber, Karlheinz Osterbichl 2 6600 Breitenwang / AT | 03 /
Friedle, Hans-Dieter Gutschau 156 6651 Häselgehr / AT | 04 /
Huber, Thomas Antoniusweg 9/7 6600 Breitenwang / AT | 05 /
Schedle, Dietmar Ehrenbergstrasse 42 6600 Reutte / AT | 06 /
Mair, Sandra Friedrich-Attlmayrstrasse 38 6600 Reutte / AT | 07 /
Friedrich, Thomas Hafenfeldweg 12 87642 Halblech / DE | 08 /
Zabernig, Anton Dr. Ing. Paul Schwarzkopfstrasse 31 6600 Reutte / AT | 09 /
Wörle, Nadine Brandstatt 117 6600 Musau / AT | [2007/11] | Application number, filing date | 06018825.7 | 08.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | AT20050000615U | 13.09.2005 Original published format: AT 61505 U | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762376 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762376 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762376 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, B23K20/08 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
B23K20/085 (EP,US);
B23K31/00 (KR);
B23K20/08 (KR);
B23K20/227 (EP,US);
B23K20/233 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
B23K2103/12 (EP,US);
B23K2103/14 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,US);
B23K2103/20 (EP,US);
B23K2103/22 (EP,US);
Y02E30/10 (EP);
Y10T29/49806 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | B32B15/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Werkstoffverbund mit explosionsgeschweisstem Zwischenstück | [2007/11] | English: | Composite material with explosion welded intermediate part | [2007/11] | French: | Matériau composite avec partie intermédiaire soudée par explosion | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | IE | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 27.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1248794 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4193529 (DICK CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4241433 (HAMPEL HEINRICH [BE]) [X] 1-12* the whole document * |