EP1726509 - Ball-screw assembly isolator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center MC 482-C23-B21 Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lynn, Randy R. 362 South Shearer Road Gladwin MI 48624-1150 / US | 02 /
Birsching, Joel Edward 1034 Athletic Street Vassar MI 48768 / US | 03 /
King, David E. 12204 Pierce Road Freeland MI 48623 / US | 04 /
Champagne, Anthony J. 4148 Morning Dawn Drive Saginaw MI 48603 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/48] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06018842.2 | 03.06.2002 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20010895821 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 895821 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726509 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726509 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, F16H25/22 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
F16H25/24 (EP,US);
B62D5/0448 (EP,US);
F16H25/2204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/48] | Title | German: | Kugelgewindespindelisolator | [2006/48] | English: | Ball-screw assembly isolator | [2006/48] | French: | Isolateur d'un ensemble vis et écrou à billes | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02077178.8 / EP1270369 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.03.2010 | GB | 03.06.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/16] | IT | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4660671 (BEHR MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,11-13,16,26-32 * page 4, line 24 - page 9, line 35; figures 2,7 * * column 2, line 17 - line 28 * * column 8, line 42 - line 48; figure 7 *[A] 14,18-20,23,24; | [X]US4735271 (SHIMIZU YASUO [JP]) [X] 1-13,16-34 * the whole document * * column 5, line 60 - line 64; figure 1 * * column 4, line 34 - line 49; figure 1 * | Examination | GB1401786 | by applicant | - MABIE & REINHOLZ., "Mechanisms and the Dynamics of Mechanisms and Dynamics of Machinery" 4th ed., (1987), pages 11-14 - 582-599 |