EP1763979 - Agricultural ground roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steen, Rüdiger Hohenkamp 4 27798 Hude / DE | [2007/12] | Application number, filing date | 06018911.5 | 09.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | DE20051044570 | 17.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005044570 | DE20061031276 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006031276 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763979 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763979 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01B29/04 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A01B29/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Bodenwalze | [2007/12] | English: | Agricultural ground roller | [2007/12] | French: | Rouleau agricole de sol | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2006 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | GB | 09.09.2014 | IE | 09.09.2014 | LU | 09.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.09.2006 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 09.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10307396 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4018366 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 4 - column 5, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0365050 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 19 - column 6, line 25; figure 1 * |