EP1764062 - Shaped body made of dental alloy for making a dental restoration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTAURUM GmbH & Co. KG Turnstrasse 31 75228 Ispringen / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states DENTAURUM J.P. WINKELSTROETER KG Turnstrasse 31 75228 Ispringen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sernetz, Friedrich, Dr. Weissenburgstrasse 32 75173 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
Lindigkeit, Jürgen, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 17-1 75203 Königsbach-Stein / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019128.5 | 13.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | DE20051045698 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005045698 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764062 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764062 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/20 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
A61C13/20 (EP,US);
B22F3/15 (EP,US);
B22F2003/1106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Formkörper aus einer Dentallegierung zur Herstellung von dentalen Teilen | [2007/12] | English: | Shaped body made of dental alloy for making a dental restoration | [2007/12] | French: | Forme en alliage dentaire pour la fabrication de restauration dentaire | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2013 | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.01.2016
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Edelstahlwerke GmbH Auestrasse 4 58452 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/07] | 16.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.08.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.08.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/05] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.04.2015 | LI | 08.04.2015 | [2018/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19714178 (MEGADENTA GMBH DENTALPRODUKTE [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 20-28 * * column 3, lines 41-56 * * abstract *; | [X]DE19819715 (HERBST BREMER GOLDSCHLAEGEREI [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, lines 8-16 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0207911 (CK MAN AB UB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-7* page 12, lines 19-30 *; | [X]EP1240877 (BT MAGNETTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] * * abstract * | Examination | EP0294784 | US5021085 | US6379593 | WO2005039663 | EP1555332 | DE102005062837 | - KUGUSHIN A A ET AL, "Nickel -based alloy for prodn. of dental prosthesis with ceramic coating - contains chromium , molybdenum , silicon , manganese , iron , carbon , and additionally cerium", WPI / THOMSON, XP002443183 | by applicant | DE3821204 | DE10342231 |