EP1770484 - Mobile terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/14] | Mobile terminal device and program used in mobile terminal device | ||
[2017/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/07] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Toshiyuki, @NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Azami, Toshihiro, @NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Inamura, Hiroshi, @NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Kaneda, Toshio, @NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | [2018/07] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
Suzuki, Toshiyuki, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Azami, Toshihiro, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Inamura, Hiroshi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Kaneda, Toshio, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intel.Prop.Dep. Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Toyko 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/07] |
Former [2007/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019261.4 | 14.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | JP20050267540 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005267540 | JP20050267541 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005267541 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1770484 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1770484 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1770484 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G06F1/16 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G06F1/1662 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/169 (EP,US);
G06F3/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/21] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät | [2017/30] | English: | Mobile terminal device | [2017/30] | French: | Dispositif terminal mobile | [2017/30] |
Former [2007/14] | Mobiles Endgerät und Programm, welches im mobilen Endgerät benutzt wird | ||
Former [2007/14] | Mobile terminal device and program used in mobile terminal device | ||
Former [2007/14] | Dispositif terminal mobile et programme utilisé dans le dispositif terminal mobile | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 28.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.07.2017 | 03.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13153235.0 / EP2590056 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02105913 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002244791 (CANON KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002251246 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2002358154 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *; | [XYI]EP1426854 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [X] 9,14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-2c * [Y] 12,13 [I] 10,11; | [XY]US2004201576 (SHIMADA TETSUROU [JP], et al) [X] 3-5 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * [Y] 1,2,6-8; | [Y]EP1482397 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]EP1513049 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 6-8 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0207] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0105] *; | [A]EP1569079 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 11 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] ** figures 7-9 * | by applicant | JPH02105913 | JP2002358154 | EP1426854 | US2004201576 | EP1482397 | EP1513049 | EP1569079 |