Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1792695 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2011 | B1 | EP1792695 | 06.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202005018944 | 05.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE521459T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE202005018944 | 05.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202005018944U | 12.04.2007 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202005018944 | 05.12.2005 |