EP1764987 - Mobile terminal and program for pre-explanation of multi-function keys before executing the functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Toshiyuki c/o IPD NTT DoCoMo Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Azami, Toshihiro c/o IPD NTT DoCoMo Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Inamura, Hiroshi c/o IPD NTT DoCoMo Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Tomimori, Takeshi Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Fukuda, Keisaku Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kawamata, Takenori Mitsubishi Electric Corp. 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019379.4 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | JP20050270342 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005270342 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764987 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M1/2745, H04M1/247, G06F3/023 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/0233 (EP,US);
H04M1/72466 (EP,US);
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US);
H04M2250/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Programm zur Vorerklärung von Multifunktionstasten vor Ausführung der Funktionen | [2007/12] | English: | Mobile terminal and program for pre-explanation of multi-function keys before executing the functions | [2007/12] | French: | Terminal mobile et programme pour pré-expliquer des touches multi-fonctions avant d'exécuter ces fonctions | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9208285 (ADVANCED CELLULAR TELCOM INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 17 - line 30 * * page 3, line 4 - line 18 * * page 4, line 11 - line 29 * * page 6, line 11 - line 22 * * page 7, line 24 - line 29 * * page 8, line 7 - line 30 * * page 11, line 18 - line 30 * * page 12, line 24 - line 31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0859498 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 39 - line 56 *; | [A]JP2000278374 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,6* abstract *; | [Y]US2001043189 (BRISEBOIS MICHEL A [CA], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] *; | [XY]US2002057259 (SUZUKI YASUKO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 4; | [A]EP1309158 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 4,5 * |