EP1767385 - Procédé de commande de la pression de pneumatique des véhicules aux plusieures axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beru Aktiengesellschaft Mörikestrasse 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Gunter Lutherstrasse 3 75228 Ispringen / DE | 02 /
Preis, Karl-Heinrich Am Eichenwäldchen 8 77830 Bühlertal / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75175 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019418.0 | 16.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | DE20051045409 | 23.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005045409 | DE20051051951 | 29.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005051951 | [2007/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1767385 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1767385 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767385 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, B60C23/06 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/007 (EP,US);
B60C23/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reifendruckkontrolle bei mehrachsigen Fahrzeugen | [2007/13] | English: | Procédé de commande de la pression de pneumatique des véhicules aux plusieures axes | [2007/13] | French: | Method for controlling tyre pressure of multiple-axle vehicles | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 27.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IE | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4228894 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 50 - column 6, line 5 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1236588 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0031] , [0033] ** figures 7,8 *; | [A]DE10319518 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE U S LLC FARMING [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] * * figure 6 * |