EP1767486 - Vehicle crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Ehingen GmbH Dr.-Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 1 89584 Ehingen/Donau / DE | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willim, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Jahnweg 35 89079 Ulm-Unterweiler / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019470.1 | 18.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | DE20052015151U | 26.09.2005 Original published format: DE 202005015151 U | [2007/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1767486 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1767486 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767486 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/70, B66C23/36 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B66D1/36 (EP,US);
B66C23/36 (EP,US);
B66C23/62 (EP,US);
B66C23/701 (EP,US);
B66D1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/07] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugkran | [2007/13] | English: | Vehicle crane | [2007/13] | French: | Grue automotrice | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.03.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 09.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3620579 (BROWN ARCHER W, et al) [X] 1,2* figure 3 *; | [X]US4984695 (GOTO HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH07267583 (KOMATSU MEC CORP, et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0009]; figures 2,4,5 *; | [X]EP0943578 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | JPH07267583 |