EP1764564 - Sanitary water heating installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEWOFAG Gebäude Service GmbH Kirchseeoner Str. 3 81669 München / DE | [2010/14] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states GEWOFAG Gemeinnützige Wohnungsfürsorge AG München Kirchseeoner Strasse 3 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebster, Wilfried Schlesierstrasse 6 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019492.5 | 18.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | DE20051044845 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005044845 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764564 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764564 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24D17/00, F24H1/20 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F24D17/0073 (EP);
F24D17/0078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Trinkwassererwärmungsanlage | [2007/12] | English: | Sanitary water heating installation | [2007/12] | French: | Installation de chauffage d'eau sanitaire | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 21.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2006 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | AT | 18.09.2012 | GB | 18.09.2012 | IE | 18.09.2012 | IT | 18.09.2012 | LU | 18.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | DK | 01.10.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 18.09.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 18.09.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 18.09.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
IT | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19903442 (REFLEX WINKELMANN & PANNHOFF G [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19932436 (GEWOFAG GEMEINNUETZIGE WOHNUNG [DE]) [DA] 1,15* the whole document *; | [X]DE10010498 (WEINAND RALF [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 21; figure . * |